Financial history SHILLINGTON AND STONDON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 259215
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010
Total gross income £228 £558 £655 £356 £280
Total expenditure £0 £0 £180 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A