Financial history THE PARRY HOUSE WELFARE FUND

Charity number: 261730
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £340 £402 £447 £548 £536
Total expenditure £300 £700 £500 £250 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A