Accounts and annual returns THE CHRISTIAN CARE CENTRE

Charity Number: 262039
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2009 28 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2009 11 January 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2007 01 May 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 03 April 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 25 April 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 21 March 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 28 April 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 24 November 2006 24 days late
Annual return 31 December 2004 10 August 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 10 August 2005 On Time