Financial history THE CHRISTIAN CARE CENTRE

Charity number: 262039
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2004 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 30/06/2009
Total gross income £91.55k £90.54k £91.98k £115.73k £224.47k
Total expenditure £78.04k £85.16k £94.22k £112.78k £212.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A