Governing document THE SOCIETY OF LEATHER TECHNOLOGISTS AND CHEMISTS LIMITED

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 DECEMBER 1951 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 23 OCTOBER 1972, 27 SEPTEMBER 1974, 6 OCTOBER 1985 AND 9 OCTOBER 1992.
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST AND ENCOURAGE THE APPLICATION OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY TO THE MANUFACTURE AND UTILISATION OF LEATHER AND RELATED PRODUCTS AND, BY THE PUBLICATION OF JOURNALS AND THE HOLDING OF MEETINGS, TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF SCIENTIFIC KNOWLEDGE IN THE LEATHER INDUSTRY. (FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED THE 22ND DECEMBER 1951)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.