Trustees THE SOCIETY OF LEATHER TECHNOLOGISTS AND CHEMISTS LIMITED
Charity number: 262247

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kristopher Macdonald | Trustee | 26 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Karl Bernard Flowers | Trustee | 26 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Anthony Payne | Trustee | 26 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Henry Abbott | Trustee | 26 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Marcus | Trustee | 27 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Dunning | Trustee | 27 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Thompson | Trustee | 23 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Robert Trantum | Trustee | 23 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christine Mary Anscombe | Trustee | 24 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Anne Taylor | Trustee | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Avery | Trustee | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr William Robert Wise | Trustee | 21 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Miller FSLTC | Trustee | 23 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.