Financial history THE COLEGRAVE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 262892
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2004 30/06/2005 30/06/2006 30/06/2007 30/06/2008
Total gross income £107.11k £105.87k £103.42k £110.52k £112.87k
Total expenditure £91.85k £110.19k £101.62k £106.51k £109.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A