Linked charities THE COLEGRAVE CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 262892
Removed charity
Linked charities
Governing document
DEED OF GIFT DATED DATED 26TH JUNE 2000, AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 4TH JULY 2001 AND 6TH DECEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH LEGALLY CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS, BODIES OR FUNDS OR SUCH LEGALLY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE FOUNDER SHALL DIRECT, OR IN DEFAULT OF SUCH DIRECTION, AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 25 July 2001 : Standard registration
- 25 June 2013 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.