Accounts and annual returns THE PAMELA PETERSON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 263215
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2010 12 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2009 01 December 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 07 October 2009 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2008 13 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2008 28 July 2008 On Time