Financial history THE PAMELA PETERSON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 263215
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2006 05/04/2007 05/04/2008 05/04/2009 31/08/2010
Total gross income £1.09k £1.09k £1.09k £899 £502
Total expenditure £448 £1.51k £1.11k £1.42k £19.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A