Accounts and annual returns GOLDEN JUBILEE FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 263410
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 21 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 15 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 29 October 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 14 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 23 July 2008 174 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 05 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required