Financial history GOLDEN JUBILEE FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 263410
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £8.59k £6.49k £8.02k £7.83k £6.71k
Total expenditure £9.44k £8.75k £18.89k £12.40k £8.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A