Accounts and annual returns THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF RAVENSWOOD

Charity number: 265305
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2020 16 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 19 November 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 05 December 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required