Financial history THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF RAVENSWOOD

Charity number: 265305
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £18.77k £19.68k £19.25k £11.69k £20.98k
Total expenditure £16.14k £17.39k £16.76k £7.45k £10.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A