Governing document Friends of Forty Hill School

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11/10/1973 AS AMENDED ON 04/11/2009 AS AMENDED ON 31/01/2013 as amended on 06 May 2022 as amended on 29 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
The object of the association (the objects) is to advance the education of pupils in the school in particular by: 2.1 Developing effective relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the school 2.2 Engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the school and advance the education of the pupils.
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF FORTY HILL CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.