Financial history FRANCIS GEORGE THORPE TRUST

Charity Number: 268201
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2008 05/04/2009 05/04/2010 05/04/2011 05/04/2012
Total gross income £4.35k £3.58k £1.78k £47.86k £5.55k
Total expenditure £5.06k £4.77k £2.32k £43.83k £6.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A