Accounts and annual returns THE CLIFFORD H WALLIS AND SUSSEX ROYAL ARCH BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 269634
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2009 19 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 20 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required