Financial history THE CLIFFORD H WALLIS AND SUSSEX ROYAL ARCH BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 269634
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009
Total gross income £6.09k £7.17k £9.34k £6.44k £8.45k
Total expenditure £3.14k £9.85k £2.80k £1.55k £3.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A