Financial history THE LANGLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 269720
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £36.14k £1.31k £43.48k £22.97k £23.87k
Total expenditure £29.54k £18.41k £43.77k £33.67k £23.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.67k £5.00k N/A