Accounts and annual returns THE SAINT FRANCIS CHARITY FOR ANIMALS

Charity Number: 269907
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 19 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 07 February 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2015 29 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2014 28 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2014 Not Required