Financial history THE SAINT FRANCIS CHARITY FOR ANIMALS

Charity Number: 269907
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2013 30/09/2014 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017
Total gross income £521 £1.81k £420 £420 £420
Total expenditure £521 £1.20k £2.22k £2.98k £1.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A