Accounts and annual returns ASHDOWN HOUSE SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED
Charity Number: 269929
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | 23 December 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | 29 December 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | 13 March 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | 20 January 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | 29 April 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | 29 April 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2006 | 28 June 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2006 | 28 June 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2005 | 07 July 2006 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2005 | 07 July 2006 | 7 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window