Financial history ASHDOWN HOUSE SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED

Charity Number: 269929
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2005 31/08/2006 31/08/2007 31/08/2008 31/08/2009
Total gross income £2.96m £2.57m £2.72m £2.57m £2.74m
Total expenditure £2.84m £2.73m £2.75m £2.64m £2.78m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £25.43k £7.41k £2.78k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £16.57k £26.58k £32.93k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £2.64m £2.52m £2.70m
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £32.09k £12.62k £4.69k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £2.74m £2.62m £2.77m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £11.42k £14.75k £14.74k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0