Accounts and annual returns UFFCULME VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity Number: 270848
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2018 30 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 26 August 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2016 28 June 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 Not Required