Accounts and annual returns ERITH SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 271011
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2014 17 February 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2013 23 May 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2013 Not Required