Financial history ERITH SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 271011
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2010 31/07/2011 31/07/2012 31/07/2013 31/07/2014
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £1.52k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A