Accounts and annual returns THE WORLD STUDENT DRAMA TRUST

Charity Number: 271191
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2012 24 March 2013 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 05 June 2012 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 17 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required