Financial history THE WORLD STUDENT DRAMA TRUST

Charity Number: 271191
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 05/04/2012
Total gross income £537 £369 £15 £13 £7
Total expenditure £1.14k £1.47k £3.08k £2.33k £1.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A