Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF THE V & A

Charity number: 272056
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 01 April 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 01 April 2017 08 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 08 January 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 22 December 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 January 2017 On Time