Governing document THE FRIENDS OF THE V & A
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 6TH JULY 1976 AS AMENDED ON 13TH NOVEMBER 1978, 28TH SEPTEMBER 1987, 7TH NOVEMBER 1991, 4TH NOVEMBER 1998 AND 17TH NOVEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE FOSTER ASSIST AND PROMOTE THE CHARITABLE WORK AND ACTIVITIES OF THE VICTORIA AND ALBERT MUSEUM OR OF ANY OTHER ART GALLERY OR MUSEUM (WHICH IS NOT CONDUCTED FOR PRIVATE PROFIT AND TO WHICH THE PUBLIC HAVE ACCESS AS OF RIGHT) SELECTED BY THE COMMITTEE OF ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.