Governing document THE FRIENDS OF UPTON COUNTRY PARK

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 SEPTEMBER 1976 AS AMENDED 16 JUNE 1980, 30 MARCH 1981, 29 MARCH 1999, 4/4/2005 AND 3/4/06 as amended on 08 Apr 2013 as amended on 30 Mar 2015 as amended on 20 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATIONAL AND PHYSICAL RECREATIONAL ASPECTS OF THE UPTON COUNTRY PARK AREA (WHICH, FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CONSTITUTION, SHALL BE DEEMED TO INCLUDE UPTON HOUSE AND ITS ASSOCIATED BUILDINGS) AND TO IMPROVE THE AREA AND THE FACILITIES AND AMENITIES WITHIN IT FOR SO LONG AS, IN THE OPINION OF THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE THAT AREA SHALL BE MAINTAINED AS A COUNTRY PARK AND AS A PLACE OF ARCHITECTURAL AND NATURAL BEAUTY.
Area of benefit
POOLE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.