Trustees THE FRIENDS OF UPTON COUNTRY PARK

Charity number: 272450
Charity reporting is up to date (63 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robert Griffin Trustee 01 June 2024
None on record
Lindsey Mumford Trustee 15 May 2023
None on record
Diana Butler Trustee 15 May 2023
None on record
Nick Woods Trustee 12 August 2020
None on record
Maggie Wood Trustee 08 April 2019
None on record
Caroline Leppan Trustee 08 April 2019
None on record
Kathy Dinmore Trustee 07 April 2014
None on record
MARY CARR Trustee
None on record
MR MIKE YEOMANS Trustee
None on record