Accounts and annual returns WISBOROUGH GREEN TRUST

Charity number: 272498
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 09 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 10 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 08 March 2022 221 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 08 March 2022 586 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required