Accounts and annual returns THE COWDEN CHURCH FUND

Charity number: 272559
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2012 09 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2012 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2011 23 November 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2011 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2010 25 November 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2010 Not Required