Financial history THE COWDEN CHURCH FUND

Charity Number: 272559
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2008 05/04/2009 05/04/2010 05/04/2011 05/04/2012
Total gross income £3.06k £1.09k £298 £1.36k £1.46k
Total expenditure £906 £3.06k £2.41k £3.93k £10.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A