Financial history THE WORLINGWORTH COMMUNITY COUNCIL

Charity number: 273866
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.98k £29.29k £7.21k £20.34k £43.75k
Total expenditure £18.62k £13.19k £14.75k £19.41k £25.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.05k £21.71k N/A £2.57k £3.14k