Accounts and annual returns THE WOOLNOTH SOCIETY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 274008
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2010 19 November 2011 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 25 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 12 November 2009 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 12 November 2009 12 days late
Annual return 31 December 2007 01 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 01 September 2008 On Time