Financial history THE WOOLNOTH SOCIETY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 274008
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010
Total gross income £63.02k £37.76k £12.12k £11.93k £4.16k
Total expenditure £48.48k £35.12k £40.51k £18.80k £1.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A