Trustees THE ARDEN THEATRE GROUP

Charity number: 274906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joanna Andrews Chair 19 March 2015
None on record
Benjamin David Fawcett Jones Trustee 11 February 2025
None on record
Sue Gower Trustee 06 June 2023
None on record
Brian Denton Trustee 10 May 2022
None on record
RICHARD JOHN ANDREWS Trustee 01 April 2019
None on record