Accounts and annual returns MAGDALEN CHAPEL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 274949
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2009 30 June 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 30 September 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 30 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 31 October 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 19 September 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 20 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required