Financial history MAGDALEN CHAPEL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 274949
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009
Total gross income £6.15k £7.15k £8.24k £7.15k £7.65k
Total expenditure £6.19k £6.68k £7.39k £6.83k £6.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A