Accounts and annual returns THE TUNBRIDGE WELLS ASSOCIATION TRUST FUND

Charity number: 275114
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 30 November 2019 20 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2018 20 February 2020 143 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2017 19 March 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not Required