Financial history THE TUNBRIDGE WELLS ASSOCIATION TRUST FUND

Charity number: 275114
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2015 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019
Total gross income £1.23k £1.14k £326 £0 £0
Total expenditure £10.91k £25.69k £0 £0 £4.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A