Accounts and annual returns THE ROTARY CLUB OF WOODBRIDGE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 276111
Charity reporting is up to date (20 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 20 May 2025 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 28 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 23 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 15 August 2022 107 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 13 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required