Financial history THE ROTARY CLUB OF WOODBRIDGE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 276111
Charity reporting is up to date (20 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £12.39k £7.98k £13.02k £24.35k £19.37k
Total expenditure £17.67k £8.85k £7.22k £28.51k £14.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A