Accounts and annual returns THE FIRE SERVICES NATIONAL MUSEUM TRUST COLLECTION

Charity number: 276571
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 January 2022 357 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 January 2022 357 days late
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 January 2022 723 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 May 2020 476 days late