Financial history THE FIRE SERVICES NATIONAL MUSEUM TRUST COLLECTION

Charity number: 276571
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £53.78k £73.75k £900 £31.11k £7.92k
Total expenditure £49.01k £72.95k £43.62k £41.16k £7.90k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A