Accounts and annual returns THE SIR ROBERT MENZIES MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 278172
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2012 08 July 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2012 08 July 2013 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2011 14 December 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2011 14 December 2011 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2010 18 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2010 18 January 2011 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2009 25 March 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2009 25 March 2010 On Time