Governing document THE SIR ROBERT MENZIES MEMORIAL TRUST
Charity number: 278172
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12/06/1979 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 01/02/1983 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 11/07/2005 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 28/04/1992 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 25/05/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND AUSTRALIA.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
UNITED KINGDOM AND AUSTRALIA
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.