Accounts and annual returns THE KERALA FEDERATION FOR THE BLIND

Charity number: 278415
Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 20 July 2023 165 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 02 May 2022 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 08 April 2021 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required